U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ikard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Service by Publication]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • August 16, 2021: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Inquiry of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.