U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baltazar-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 24, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.