U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frederick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 16, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • June 16, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 04, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Proposed Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 11, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.