U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 31, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.