U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.