U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00339-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aznar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 02, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 06, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • July 06, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - First Step Act]
  • February 22, 2021: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.