U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARPENTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • February 22, 2021: [Reduce Sentence re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.