U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 05, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Service by Publication]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 02, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.