U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • November 17, 2022: [Quash ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 16, 2022: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Request]
  • August 30, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • August 12, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 05, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 04, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.