U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 13, 2021: [Exclude]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.