U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PURI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Telephonic Notice]
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Motions Referred]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.