U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MONTGOMERY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • October 07, 2024: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
  • October 06, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • August 26, 2021: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 19, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 02, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 19, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 16, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.