U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARROQUIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.