U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00465-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 02, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 25, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 23, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 23, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.