U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 11, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.