U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GONZALEZ-CASTILLO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • March 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.