U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FEWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • May 13, 2025: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • May 12, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • July 06, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 25, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 25, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.