U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARMSTRONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 17, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 11, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Exclude]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.