U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • January 19, 2023: [Memorandum]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 22, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Exam Report SEALED]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Seal ]
  • March 26, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2021: [Request]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.