U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NORIZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.