U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALSTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice-Other]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 19, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.