U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • June 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 02, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 24, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 02, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 26, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.