U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMPSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2014 Amendment]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.