U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Compassionate Release - 18:3582]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 17, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 18, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 15, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arrest]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.