U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 09, 2021: [Prob12C Warrant - Order on Petition for Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.