U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 27, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
  • April 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.