U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.