U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 09, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Conference ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 30, 2021: [Telephonic Notice]
  • June 30, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Joint Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • March 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 26, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.