U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 29, 2021: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice-other]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 16, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 16, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.