U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Porter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 23, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 04, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.