U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Covington et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 09, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 30, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 11, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • June 17, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.