U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Text Order]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.