U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Competency Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 23, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2021: [SEALED Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • May 07, 2021: [SEALED Order]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 06, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 18, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • March 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 03, 2021: [Seal ]
  • March 03, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.