U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.