U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joyner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.