U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Document]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.