U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moss et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 31, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 26, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Seal ]
  • March 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 10, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • February 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • November 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Special Appearance]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 26, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • February 26, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.