U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUITTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • June 10, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 01, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • March 09, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 03, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.