U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.