U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 24, 2022: [Transcript - Voir Dire]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 23, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • August 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 09, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 20, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2021: [JERS Exhibits]
  • October 13, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 11, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 08, 2021: [Suppress]
  • October 07, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 04, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • October 01, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 01, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • September 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.