U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2021: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arrest]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.