U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brownlee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 23, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 23, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • March 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.