U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 17, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • April 03, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • January 31, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • March 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.