U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • March 29, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 31, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.