U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 03, 2021: [Prob49 - Waiver of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.