U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 11, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.