U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • October 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Seal ]
  • July 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.