U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 31, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.