U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 23, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2021: [Release Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 14, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.