U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Document]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • January 28, 2022: [Sequester]
  • January 28, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Reply to Response ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 26, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • March 04, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • March 04, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.